Accounts and annual returns EZER BEKOVOID LIMITED

Charity number: 1138167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 31 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 31 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 31 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 19 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 19 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 31 January 2019 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 31 January 2019 153 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2016 31 May 2018 273 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 31 May 2018 273 days late Download Open in new window