Financial history EZER BEKOVOID LIMITED

Charity number: 1138167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £991.82k £1.45m £1.31m £1.39m £1.07m
Total expenditure £861.96k £1.69m £1.49m £1.56m £1.39m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £991.82k £1.45m £1.31m £1.39m £1.07m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £39 £44
Income - Other £0 £2.75k £1.38k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £991.82k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £786.56k £1.67m £1.46m £1.53m £1.36m
Expenditure - Raising funds £73.60k £2.13k £3.92k £5.25k £5.21k
Expenditure - Governance £1.80k £8.40k £6.30k £14.80k £37.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £740.88k £1.19m £1.15m £1.16m £1.00m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £184 £1.12k
Expenditure - Other £1.80k £18.62k £19.65k £23.56k £18.92k