Accounts and annual returns ZESH REHMAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1140086
Charity reporting is overdue by 74 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 74 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 74 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 April 2022 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 August 2021 197 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 August 2020 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 August 2020 189 days late Download Open in new window