Financial history ZESH REHMAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1140086
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.00k £31.36k £0 £0 £21.22k
Total expenditure £19.65k £12.09k £7.51k £2.38k £21.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £9.85k N/A N/A N/A