BRAMPFORD SPEKE VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1139844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time Download