BRAMPFORD SPEKE VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1139844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £25.13k £17.29k £5.30k £5.92k £3.32k
Total expenditure £9.74k £44.63k £3.09k £3.98k £2.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.00k N/A N/A N/A