Financial history HOME-START CHICHESTER & DISTRICT

Charity number: 1123768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £105.98k £100.24k £120.39k £142.81k £168.66k
Total expenditure £86.04k £100.76k £108.17k £121.92k £122.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.39k £19.10k £16.34k £14.92k £18.32k