JEWISH COUNCIL FOR RACIAL EQUALITY

Charity number: 1132666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adam Isaacs Trustee 16 June 2020 None on record
Anna Lawton Trustee 16 June 2021
ALL PEOPLE ALL PLACES Received: On time
Rebecca Heller Trustee 16 June 2021 None on record
Daniel Pablo Garay Bymel Trustee 16 June 2020 None on record
Jonathan Black Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
David Thompson Trustee 17 September 2019
ONE TO ONE CHILDREN'S FUND Received: On time
Sarah Isal Williamson Trustee 26 March 2015 None on record
Adam Rose Chair 24 October 2013
THE YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE B'NAI BRITH HILLEL FOUNDATION Received: On time
MASORTI JUDAISM Received: On time
B'NAI B'RITH HILLEL FOUNDATION Received: 54 days late
KAREN GOODMAN Trustee None on record
Bruce Rothberg Trustee 16 June 2021 None on record