FRIENDS OF THE FLITCH GREEN ACADEMY

Charity number: 1126711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 October 2020 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required