FRIENDS OF THE FLITCH GREEN ACADEMY

Charity number: 1126711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £10.53k £14.89k £12.96k £4.18k £889
Total expenditure £19.35k £8.45k £18.89k £1.21k £1.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A