Financial history SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH, SHIRLEY, SOLIHULL

Charity number: 1127354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £356.03k £338.82k £379.48k £474.11k £792.51k
Total expenditure £348.11k £297.83k £312.63k £284.35k £290.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £30.63k £36.31k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £756.13k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.70k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £23.76k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £916
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £450.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £227.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £897
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £60.39k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £61.59k