Trustees SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH, SHIRLEY, SOLIHULL

Charity number: 1127354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Jones Trustee 03 April 2022
None on record
Glynis Spiller Trustee 17 November 2021
SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH, SOLIHULL
Recently registered
Peter John Close Trustee 18 November 2020
SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH, SOLIHULL
Recently registered
Sharon Elizabeth Davidson Trustee 18 November 2020
SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH, SOLIHULL
Recently registered
Stuart Alexander Fisher Trustee 18 November 2020
SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH, SOLIHULL
Recently registered
JONATHAN PAUL HIBBS Trustee 18 November 2020
SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH, SOLIHULL
Recently registered
MERCY MISSION WELFARE SOCIETY
Received: On time
Lynne Russell Trustee 18 November 2020
SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH, SOLIHULL
Recently registered
David Andrew Rose Trustee 18 November 2020
None on record
EVAN WINTER Trustee 17 February 2019
SALTMALAWI TRUST
Received: On time
SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH, SOLIHULL
Recently registered
LATIN LINK
Received: On time
EUROVANGELISM
Received: On time
BEACONLIGHT TRUST
Received: On time
Neil Ronald Aston Trustee 15 November 2018
SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH, SOLIHULL
Recently registered
Christine Canty Trustee 15 November 2017
SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH, SOLIHULL
Recently registered
Richard Arthur Millington Trustee 16 November 2014
SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH, SOLIHULL
Recently registered
REV PAUL HERBERT FRANK CAMPION Trustee
SHIRLEY BAPTIST CHURCH, SOLIHULL
Recently registered
FAMILY SUPPORT CENTRE SHIRLEY
Received: On time