Financial history FANCONI HOPE

Charity number: 1126894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £10.00k £91.78k £56.74k £27.07k £36.84k
Total expenditure £41.70k £15.60k £30.75k £20.21k £47.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A