Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ANDREW AND ST. MARY MAGDALENE, MAIDENHEAD
Charity number: 1127589

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINA MARION SANDRA BRUNT | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gestina Gracy Vijaya Crane | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Kan | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Reisser-Weston | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Dee | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linsley Adrian Green | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Mbusi Sajabi Matovu | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Karnagie Sharp | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Scott Bedford | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aletta Strydom | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ian Miller | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
CATRIONA Ketiar | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|||||
John Timothy Driscoll | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phebe Tay | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
RHYS JONES MITCHELL | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev JONATHAN CHARLES DRAKE | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev NEIL WATKINSON | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Neil James McDonald | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROB HURLEY | Trustee | 22 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS JAMES WALTON | Trustee | 22 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
RAE BINNING | Trustee | 19 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROB WINGFIELD | Trustee | 09 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATE WHEATLEY | Trustee | 09 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN BLACKBEARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.