Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, RAINFORD

Charity number: 1127817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 December 2019 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 December 2019 49 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 December 2018 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window