Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. FRANCIS, PETTS WOOD

Charity number: 1127654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £90.46k £89.22k £84.39k £158.80k £120.34k
Total expenditure £89.92k £93.81k £85.62k £145.12k £85.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A