Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE GLASCOTE & STONYDELPH TEAM

Charity number: 1132564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £223.00k £212.56k £211.69k £203.37k £180.44k
Total expenditure £208.94k £200.62k £213.17k £201.41k £165.64k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A