THE RADIANT TRUST

Charity number: 1131073
Charity reporting is overdue by 69 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 69 days
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 69 days
Annual return 01 December 2019 28 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 December 2018 31 October 2019 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 December 2017 19 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 December 2016 19 March 2018 169 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2016 Not Required