THE RADIANT TRUST

Charity number: 1131073
Charity reporting is overdue by 66 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/12/2015 01/12/2016 01/12/2017 01/12/2018 01/12/2019
Total gross income £300 £300 £300 £315 £20.31k
Total expenditure £216 £243 £278 £332 £32.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A