THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, BLETCHLEY

Charity number: 1128447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosemary Ann Slasor Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
Rebecca Jane Slingsby Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
Georgina Holden Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
Rev DAVID ROBIN MCDOUGALL Chair 01 October 2014 None on record
Ann Rolfe Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
Andrew Prince Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
Judi Cumberland Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
Rev Ben Thorpe Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
Rev Peter Landry Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
Max Johnstone Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
Christopher Day Trustee 25 April 2016
THE POOR'S ALLOTMENTS CHARITY Received: On time
Charlotte Cashman Trustee 27 April 2017
THE BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY Received: On time
BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST Received: On time
Clare Suzanne Reeves Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
STEPHEN WILLIAM WALKER Trustee 28 April 2014 None on record
SOPHIE ELIZABETH FLETCHER Trustee 27 April 2015 None on record