CREATIVE HANDS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £47.14k £23.52k £49.49k £13.09k £637
Total expenditure £40.87k £39.90k £48.76k £11.66k £4.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £600 N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A