THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, OXFORD

Charity number: 1129280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

25 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev PAUL MATTHEW WHITE Trustee 06 September 2012 None on record
Anna Bishop Trustee 13 May 2019 None on record
Dr Mark Anderton Smith Trustee 27 April 2015 None on record
SARAH DOROTHY WILCOCK Trustee 17 April 2018
ALPHA COMMUNITIES Received: On time
STEPHEN IRWIN PEREIRA Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
Stephen Saunders Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
Matty Butler Trustee 17 April 2018 None on record
Rev Dan Heyward Chair 19 September 2016
DISCOVERING PRAYER CIO Recently registered
Rebecca Catherine Ekins Trustee 05 October 2020 None on record
Charles Olver Trustee 05 October 2020 None on record
Dr Sarah Ruth Gooding Trustee 05 October 2020 None on record
Rev James Richard Dwyer Trustee 01 July 2018 None on record
Dr CONRAD JAN DIRCKX Trustee 17 July 2013 None on record
Timothy Paul Cooper Trustee 13 July 2020 None on record
Claire Lewis Trustee 17 April 2018 None on record
Rev Dr Elizabeth Jane Pitkethly Trustee 27 April 2015 None on record
Vanda King Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
Fiona Rosemary Crisp Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record
Rev Judith Madigan Harvey Trustee 12 October 2020 None on record
Rev Thomas Christopher Murray Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Harriet Frances Bayly Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
Rev Thomas William Howell Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Darrel Grant Ross Trustee 17 April 2018 None on record
Sarah Margaret Smith Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
Micheal Crofton Briggs Trustee 24 April 2017 None on record