FRIENDS OF ST ANN'S STRETFORD

Charity number: 1131356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.35k £7.03k £7.12k £8.32k £1.20k
Total expenditure £5.66k £5.48k £6.01k £4.39k £6.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A