Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NEWARK ON TRENT ST MARY MAGDALENE WITH ST LEONARD

Charity number: 1131972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Christopher Mark Lion Chair 18 October 2021
None on record
Catherine Koppana Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Michael Leggett Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
David Stanley Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Peter Searle Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
June Doubleday Trustee 19 May 2022
None on record
Anne Coyne Trustee 21 October 2020
THE FRIENDS OF THE CENTRE FOR ENGLISH LOCAL HISTORY
Received: On time
Stephen Turner Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Dr Shekaniya Matsiko Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Andrew Jonathan Fearn Trustee 24 March 2019
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: On time
NEWARK CRUSADER CIO
Received: On time
THE NEWARK AREA ARTS AND LEISURE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Susan Dutton Trustee 24 March 2019
None on record
Tony Roberts Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
Angela Mary Hatter Trustee 07 January 2018
None on record
Pam Hall Trustee 07 January 2018
None on record
Tony Yates Trustee 07 January 2018
None on record
Jackie Turner Trustee 07 January 2018
None on record
Cheryl Jasmine Rose Turner Trustee 07 January 2018
None on record
JAMES ANTHONY HOWLETT Trustee 28 April 2015
None on record
MARILYN BLAKEMAN Trustee 29 April 2014
None on record