THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN, COTTINGHAM (DIOCESE OF YORK)

Charity number: 1131553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Raymond Stow Trustee 17 April 2019 None on record
SHEILA ANN FISHER Trustee None on record
Robert Fraser McMillan Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
Ruth Elizabeth Atkinson Trustee 19 May 2021 None on record
Joy Bower Trustee 08 October 2017 None on record
Rev Nicola Jenny Bown rector Chair 23 August 2020
CHARITY OF MARK KIRBY Received: On time
Eileen Alice Holborn Trustee 17 April 2019 None on record
EILEEN BLOW Trustee 19 May 2021 None on record
DAVID ALEXANDER PENNIE Trustee 30 April 2014 None on record
Robert Andrew Penney Trustee 19 May 2021 None on record
Mrs Val Baxter Trustee 30 April 2014 None on record
Melanie Jane Drewicz Trustee 19 May 2021 None on record
HELEN MARGARET BRISTOW Trustee 16 September 2013 None on record
Aileen Mary Walker Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
HELEN MARGARET RAWDON Trustee 16 September 2013 None on record
Sarah Rebecca Blow Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
Kathleen Margaret Wright Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record
SUSAN BARBARA BRETT PHD Trustee 19 May 2021 None on record
NUDGEAN BASLEY Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record