THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, WHITKIRK

Charity number: 1130280
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £210.57k £210.57k £193.13k £418.47k £184.81k
Total expenditure £164.18k £164.18k £180.69k £589.17k £194.87k