Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, WHITKIRK
Charity number: 1130280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MATTHEW PEAT | Chair | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Roberts | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Kelly | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Jackson | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Elizabeth Williams | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE SIRRELL | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEAN PATRICIA BRADLEY | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Louise Burton | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WADDINGTON | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Christopher Black | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sue Middleditch | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GLENN STUART MIDDLEDITCH | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Melvin Herring | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Blenkinsopp | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Pickersgill | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR HEZEL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.