SUTTON COLDFIELD UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity number: 1131424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £241.20k £230.26k £230.54k £232.52k £257.89k
Total expenditure £257.44k £257.44k £217.78k £249.44k £220.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.55k £2.48k £4.08k £2.60k £7.31k