Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MAGNUS THE MARTYR WITH ST MARGARET NEW FISH STREET AND ST MICHAEL CROOKED LANE, LONDON

Charity number: 1130590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £124.64k £142.17k £150.04k £146.61k £249.89k
Total expenditure £142.01k £179.72k £167.38k £152.12k £120.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £122.24k