Financial history OAKHAM SCHOOL

Charity number: 1131425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £27.50m £27.44m £27.36m £25.66m £26.61m
Total expenditure £26.77m £27.66m £28.37m £26.79m £26.58m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.45m £495.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £79.00k £318.00k £253.00k £1.67m £680.00k
Income - Other trading activities £808.00k £667.00k £886.00k £359.00k £448.00k
Income - Charitable activities £26.17m £26.18m £26.09m £23.50m £25.38m
Income - Endowments £40.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £201.00k £176.00k £107.00k £130.00k £94.00k
Income - Other £244.00k £103.00k £18.00k £7.00k £3.00k
Income - Legacies £39.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £25.87m £26.87m £27.42m £26.07m £25.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds £251.00k £789.00k £945.00k £720.00k £724.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £28.00k £26.00k £25.00k £27.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £649.00k £0 £0 £0 £0