Trustees OAKHAM SCHOOL

Charity number: 1131425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN ROGER SUMMERTON Trustee 02 July 2020
THE THOMAS EDWARD CLARKE TRUST
Received: On time
FUNDAYS IN NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Received: On time
THE ELIZABETHAN TRUST
Received: On time
NOTTINGHAM UNIVERSITY HOSPITALS CHARITY
Received: On time
Peter Ashley Boddy Trustee 02 July 2020
None on record
Margaret Miles Trustee 19 March 2020
None on record
David Alexander Allsop Trustee 13 June 2019
None on record
Dr Sarah Furness Trustee 14 June 2018
UPPINGHAM SCHOOL
Received: On time
RUTLAND GRANTS
Received: On time
RUTLAND HISTORIC CHURCHES PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Professor Philip Baker Trustee 14 June 2018
None on record
The Very Reverend Christopher Charles Dalliston Trustee 14 June 2018
None on record
Professor Stewart Alan Petersen Trustee 08 March 2018
None on record
Rashmi Patel Trustee 30 November 2017
None on record
Mark Dorsett Trustee 30 November 2017
None on record
STEPHEN HOWARD WOOLFE Trustee 19 June 2014
THE NATIONAL FOREST CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROYAL LEICESTERSHIRE REGIMENT MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
THE ROYAL LEICESTERSHIRE REGIMENT GENERAL FUND
Received: On time
THE ROYAL LEICESTERSHIRE REGIMENT CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time
THE GERTRUDE ROGERS TRUST FUND
Received: On time
JANE LUCAS Trustee 19 June 2014
THE ELIZABETHAN TRUST
Received: On time
Josephine Osborne Trustee 13 March 2014
None on record
JULIA GRUNDY Trustee 19 November 2013
None on record
PROFESSOR NEIL T GORMAN Trustee 02 September 2013
THE ELIZABETHAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE RT REVD THE LORD BISHOP OF PETERBOROUGH Trustee 25 June 2012
THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST AND OF ST ANNE IN OKEHAM
Received: On time