Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY PORTSEA, PORTSMOUTH

Charity number: 1130813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £171.95k £177.00k £196.19k £302.50k £549.90k
Total expenditure £202.08k £216.98k £218.57k £367.55k £696.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £526.53k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £21.90k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £34.67k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.47k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £526.53k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £696.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0