Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY PORTSEA, PORTSMOUTH
Charity number: 1130813
Charity reporting is up to date (140 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Robert Charles WHITE | Chair | 10 June 2000 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
Cecilia Delmege | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
Beverley Ann Nicholson | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Rajiv Daniel Sidhu | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
Susan Simms | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
David Hambrook | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
Margaret Moles | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
Stuart Butler | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
Alison Barnicott | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
DEBRA ANNE OLIVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
CHRISTINE MARGERY LAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
EUGENE FREDERICK ORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
SANDRA AVIS HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
SHIRLEY ANNE RUDDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
JACQULINE ANN FISHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
PAUL JAMES MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
ROBERT RYMILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
JENNIFER MARY STEMP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
Rev SUSAN KAREN WHITELOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
Irene Anne James | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||
JEANIE LORRAINE DRINKWATER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.