ORRELL HOLGATE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT, STAFF AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1130184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 25 November 2019 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 03 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required