THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF YATTON MOOR

Charity number: 1132177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LESLEY EVE FARRALL Trustee 21 May 2015 None on record
MIKE COOKE Trustee 28 April 2016 None on record
John allday Trustee 21 May 2018 None on record
MARK STEPHEN HUMPHRIES Trustee 28 April 2016 None on record
PAUL EDWARD STALDER Trustee None on record
MARIANNA JANE MACKAY Trustee None on record
PATRICIA DENNY Trustee 21 May 2018
YATTON LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY Received: On time
ANN LONG Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
Sian Buckley-Lewis Trustee 21 April 2021 None on record
Karen Baber Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
ERIC JOHN BALL Trustee None on record
Prudence Witter Trustee 21 April 2021 None on record
JULIA BUSH Trustee 21 May 2018 None on record
CAROLINE HOLDEN Trustee 30 April 2015 None on record
SUE THOMAS Trustee 21 May 2015 None on record
SUE LANG Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
REVD TIM SCOTT Chair 17 July 2014
ALFRED TELLING CHARITABLE FUND Received: On time
Judith Mary Seward Trustee 21 April 2021 None on record