GAINSBOROUGH ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND LTD

Charity number: 1130827
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 March 2021 53 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 08 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 01 August 2016 On time Download