VERA KAYE ROLLIT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 500391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £22.35k £20.51k £23.10k £23.99k £23.06k
Total expenditure £14.05k £20.14k £14.67k £24.58k £35.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A