THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, SHORTLANDS

Charity number: 1130802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Bingham Trustee 01 May 2021 None on record
ANN-MARIE JEFFERYS Trustee 29 April 2009
GUILD OF FREEMEN OF THE CITY OF LONDON'S CHARITY Received: On time
FRANCON TRUST Received: On time
Hazel Leach Trustee 01 May 2021 None on record
Sue Slaney Trustee 01 May 2021 None on record
Professor Mark Fox Trustee 29 April 2012 None on record
Gloria Sherman Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
TIM DAWSON Trustee None on record
Jan Boam Trustee 19 March 2017 None on record
Rev Gary John Best Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
ROBIN HOGG Trustee 27 April 2014 None on record
Dr DAVID BARRINGTON JEFFERYS Trustee 08 February 2013
THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES GENERAL CHARITY LIMITED Received: On time
FACULTY OF THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE AND PHARMACY OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON Received: On time
FACULTY OF CONFLICT AND CATASTROPHE MEDICINE OF THE WORSHIPFUL SOCIETY OF APOTHECARIES OF LONDON Received: On time
Sarah Leonard Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Lynsey Grover Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
KEITH MILLS Trustee 27 April 2014
MARY MACARTHUR HOLIDAY TRUST Received: On time
Catherine Louise Buchanan Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
HEATHER WILLS Trustee None on record
Rachel Tollotson Trustee 01 May 2021 None on record
Stephanie Maurel Trustee 22 April 2018
THE NATIONAL CHILDBIRTH TRUST Received: 7 days late
PATRICIA CHASE Trustee None on record
JULIE FOX Trustee 29 April 2009 None on record