THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF S.ANDREW WEST TARRING

Charity number: 1130723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN ALEXANDER Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
Jane Margaret Wells Trustee 15 April 2015 None on record
Leonard George WEBB Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record
MARGARET PHYLLIS STURMEY Trustee 21 June 2011 None on record
Liz Rita Marie McCarthy Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record
KATHLEEN SHUTTLEWORTH Trustee 17 April 2016 None on record
Frances Spencer Trustee 21 July 2015 None on record
PAUL EDWARD HUGH WYTHAME HALSTEAD Trustee 21 June 2011 None on record
Caroline Emma BIRCH Trustee 10 November 2020 None on record
HAZEL DAWN JANE WHITTAKER Trustee None on record
Rev MARK JOHN LYON Chair 17 July 2015
CHICHESTER DIOCESAN PILGRIMAGE COMMITTEE Recently registered
Valerie Jill Audrey UNDERWOOD Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record
LEAH BARRS Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
PEGGY MULHOLLAND Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record