Trustees THE BENEFICE OF EGLWYSILAN AND CAERPHILLY PCC

Charity number: 1131172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DERYN GAY MCANDREW MA CANTAB Chair
None on record
Laurence Harry Brown Trustee 07 April 2022
None on record
Lesley Owens Trustee 07 April 2022
None on record
Dr John Harry Pettit Trustee 07 April 2022
None on record
Emily Burniston MA, PGCE Trustee 07 April 2022
None on record
Heulwen Handley Trustee 07 January 2022
None on record
Bronwen Parish Trustee 07 January 2022
None on record
Julia Rawlins Trustee 22 April 2021
None on record
Nerys Rhiannon Beckett Trustee 02 May 2019
None on record
Duncan Stuart McAndrew Trustee 11 April 2019
None on record
DAPHNE MELVILLE HOLDSWORTH BA HONS Trustee 22 March 2018
None on record
REV Pauline Patricia Smith Trustee 22 March 2018
None on record
Alan Dixon Trustee 22 March 2018
None on record
Margaret Elizabeth Ware Trustee 06 April 2017
TWYN COMMUNITY CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE
Received: On time
CLIVE MARTIN EVANS Trustee 06 April 2017
None on record
MARY GEORGINA DUGGAN Trustee 06 April 2017
None on record
JANICE MARGARET ROBERTS BSc M Ed Trustee 17 March 2016
None on record
ANGELA ANDERSON BA, MA Trustee 18 April 2012
None on record
PETER MORGRUGYN JONES Trustee
None on record
JOHN CHILD DL FCA Trustee
None on record