OWEN STREET COMMUNITY ARTS CENTRE

Charity number: 1134940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £13.10k £11.26k £12.83k £12.42k £11.21k
Total expenditure £12.95k £11.42k £10.94k £9.96k £6.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.83k £0 N/A N/A £7.50k