Accounts and annual returns THEATRE ABSOLUTE

Charity number: 1134077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window