Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1132965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christina Tresilian Barry Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Julia Evans Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Joanne Caroline Wroe Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Stephanie Jane Hoskin Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Helen Anne Robbins Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Peter Frank Parsons Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Rodney Andrew Hawkins Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Elisabeth von Rabenau Trustee 21 March 2021
None on record
Robert McCorquodale Trustee 01 April 2020
CHRISTIAN BLIND MISSION (UNITED KINGDOM) LIMITED
Received: On time
Ann Barrett Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Helen Dalgleish Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Bryony Webb Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Anthony Bullock Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Frances Harris Trustee 04 March 2018
None on record
ANDREW GORDON Trustee 17 May 2016
None on record
Martin Russell Evans Trustee 01 March 2016
THE CAMBRIDGE CITY FOODBANK
Received: On time
ALISON HORNSBURY Trustee 22 March 2015
None on record