Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ORE

Charity number: 1131079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £114.46k £95.76k £137.13k £88.48k £123.09k
Total expenditure £101.94k £105.96k £107.89k £115.10k £110.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £2.20k N/A