Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ORE

Charity number: 1131079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Timothy Liam Bell Chair 14 September 2020
None on record
Peter Bailey Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Rev Kizzy Anna Penfold Trustee 27 June 2021
None on record
Nicholas John Erskin Warren Trustee 17 May 2021
ICKLESHAM MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
Suzanne Claire Edwards Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Roger Campbell Pook Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Dr Susanne Jones MRCGP, MB Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Linda Susan Chapman-Holmes Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Peter Anthony Aitken Trustee 14 September 2020
None on record
Christine Elizabeth Aitken B Sc Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
Jason Morton Trustee 23 April 2018
None on record
Simon Jones Trustee 23 April 2018
None on record
Lynn Elizabeth White Trustee 28 April 2014
HASTINGS SIERRA LEONE FRIENDSHIP LINK
Received: On time
DR DAVID MICHAEL WALKER Trustee 06 June 2013
PARCHMENT TRUST
Received: On time
ROGER JAMES MITCHELL M.A., M.ED Trustee
HASTINGS SIERRA LEONE FRIENDSHIP LINK
Received: On time
LOAF PROJECT
Received: On time
HASTINGS CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: 21 days late
SARA - JANE HACKETT Trustee
None on record