Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, GUISBOROUGH
Charity number: 1132453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Alison Phillipson | Chair | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Helen Claire Wells | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Keen | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David William Welsh | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELEN BOWMAKER | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Milburn | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharron Anne Ackerley | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Clay | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mr Chris Nicholson | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Leonard Douglass | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Sue Leather | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Louise Mary Brownlie | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALWYN JONES | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Webb | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN ELLIS | Trustee | 11 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFF HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.