THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, HAUGHTON GREEN

Charity number: 1131528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Glew Chair 30 April 2017 None on record
SHAUN DAVID WAINWRIGHT Trustee 21 April 2016 None on record
SIMON LUKE HIRST Trustee None on record
ERIC BYNON Trustee None on record
Peter Marsh Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
DANIEL POMFRET Trustee 26 April 2018 None on record
JOHN HULME Trustee 10 April 2014
HOPE HOUSE (ENJU YA'MASIKO) Received: On time
JULIE MARY COPE Trustee None on record
GEORGE COPE Trustee 16 April 2015
THE ROTARY CLUB OF NEW MILLS MARPLE AND DISTRICT BENEVOLENT FUND Received: On time
HOPE HOUSE (ENJU YA'MASIKO) Received: On time
Gordon Bunting Trustee 26 April 2017 None on record
KEITH WILLIAM HORSFIELD Trustee None on record
Elizabeth Bowden Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
LANCE WALTER DUFFY Trustee None on record
NEIL FLINT Trustee 21 April 2016 None on record
Jessica Anne Pattison Trustee
HOPE HOUSE (ENJU YA'MASIKO) Received: On time
Karen Doughton Trustee 20 May 2019 None on record
BRIAN JEFFRIES Trustee None on record
ALWYN HORSFIELD Trustee None on record
Alyson Buckley Trustee 22 October 2013 None on record