Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. STEPHEN, SOUNDWELL, BRISTOL

Charity number: 1131503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £103.59k £119.20k £113.87k £98.63k £169.77k
Total expenditure £95.90k £103.05k £109.85k £97.14k £110.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A