Financial history TRUST IN LEARNING LIMITED

Charity number: 1131823
Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £1.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £183 £13 £13 £13 £13
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A