Financial history RAF HONINGTON SERGEANTS' MESS

Charity number: 1131113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £146.35k £149.70k £122.34k £34.96k £106.03k
Total expenditure £141.47k £115.03k £117.09k £30.19k £110.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A